Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Stanslaus Skutans, M.I.C. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1901BornLatvia
192827.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
193029.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
26 Jul 195756.5AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
2 Jul 196362.5ResignedSuperior General of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
25 Feb 199594.1DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary

MicroData Summary for Stanslaus Skutans:
Father Stanslaus Skutans M.I.C. (died ) Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary

  • a priest for 65.1 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015