Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Krzysztof Adrian Skrzetuski, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Bacău


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1661¹BornKrakow
23 Sep 171554.7AppointedBishop of Bacău, Romania
13 Nov 171554.8DiedBishop-Elect of Bacău, Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Krzysztof Adrian Skrzetuski:
Father Krzysztof Adrian Skrzetuski O.F.M. Conv. (born 1661, died ) Bishop-Elect of Bacău

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 111
  • d: CB, 2 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 3 Jul 2015