Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Stefano Siri

Deceased

Bishop of Sagone (Sagona), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1601³Born
19 Jan 163231.0AppointedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
25 Jan 163231.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
Jan 1635³33.9DiedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Stefano Siri
Bishop Giovanni Stefano Siri (born , died Jan 1635) Bishop of Sagone (Sagona)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavona
Ordained BishopBarberini Chapel, Sant’Andrea della Valle, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 300
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 43
  • ob/c2: AT, 5 Sep 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,995

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast