Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pankraz von Sinzenhofen

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Apr 1538SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
15 Nov 1538ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
25 Apr 1539Ordained BishopBishop of Regensburg, Germany
24 Jul 1548DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Pankraz von Sinzenhofen (VIAF: 28146675)
Bishop Pankraz von Sinzenhofen (died ) Bishop of Regensburg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRegensburg, Diocese of Regensburg

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 282
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1539, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast