Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Simon

Deceased

Archbishop of Sassari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1728¹Born
28 Sep 179870.7AppointedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
31 Mar 179971.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
12 Feb 180678.1DiedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Simon
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Simon (born 1728, died ) Archbishop of Sassari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassari

  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 423
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,827
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1799, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast