Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gavino Murro

Deceased

Archbishop of Sassari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1739BornSassari
29 Mar 179960.2SelectedBishop of Bosa, Italy
11 Aug 180061.5ConfirmedBishop of Bosa, Italy
Sep 180061.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
27 Feb 181980.1SelectedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
29 Mar 181980.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
1820¹80.9DiedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gavino Murro:
Archbishop Gavino Murro (born ) Archbishop of Sassari

  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 115, and Page 381

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013