Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Cardinal Serra

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570BornGenoa, Italy
17 Aug 161141.6Elevated to Cardinal
12 Sep 161141.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
28 Sep 161545.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
19 Aug 162353.6DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Serra:
Cardinal Giacomo Serra (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace

  • a cardinal for 12.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Aug 1611

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013