Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonardo de Sermineto, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Giovinazzo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Feb 1253AppointedBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy
7 Mar 1253Ordained BishopBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Leonardo de Sermineto
Bishop Leonardo de Sermineto O. Cist. , Bishop of Giovinazzo

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 288
  • ob/c2+: CB, 21 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast