Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccola Sermattei

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1701Born
20 Nov 173533.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 175553.2AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
19 Mar 175553.2Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
11 Mar 178078.2DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccola Sermattei
Bishop Niccola Sermattei (born , died ) Bishop of Assisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAssisi

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 102
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast