Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Serafini

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1786Born
27 Jan 184356.2Elevated to Cardinal
27 Jan 184356.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
16 Apr 184659.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
1 Feb 185568.2DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Serafini
Giovanni Cardinal Serafini (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMagliano, Italy

  • a cardinal for 12.0 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast