Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gregorio Cardinal Selleri, O.P. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1654Born
9 Dec 172672.4Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
30 Apr 172873.7Elevated to Cardinal
10 May 172873.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
31 May 172974.8DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Selleri
Gregorio Cardinal Selleri O.P. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino

EventPlace
Birth PlacePanicale, Italy

  • a cardinal for 2.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Dec 1726

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast