Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stephanus Sciran, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643²Born
15 Jan 170360.0AppointedArchbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia
21 Jan 170360.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia
1707²64.0DiedArchbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stephanus Sciran
Archbishop Stephanus Sciran O.P. (born 1643, died 1707) Archbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSciahbuni, Archdiocese of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan)
Ordained BishopSanta Maria sopra Minerva, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 281
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 51
  • ob: AT, 9 Aug 2020
  • ob/c2: AT, 19 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast