Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Günther von Schwarzburg

Deceased

Archbishop of Magdeburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1382¹Born
12 Oct 140321.7AppointedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
13 Jul 140422.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
23 Mar 144563.2DiedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Günther von Schwarzburg (VIAF: 40170115)
Archbishop Günther von Schwarzburg (born 1382, died ) Archbishop of Magdeburg

  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 321
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,774
  • ob/c2+: ATh

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Feb 2016