Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bonaventura Josef Schweizer, S.D.S. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Society of the Divine Savior


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1893BornEbnet, Germany
29 Jun 192127.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Savior
195359.4AppointedSuperior General of Society of the Divine Savior
196571.4ResignedSuperior General of Society of the Divine Savior
2 Jun 196874.9DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Society of the Divine Savior

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Josef Schweizer:
Father Bonaventura Josef Schweizer S.D.S. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Society of the Divine Savior

  • a priest for 46.9 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015