Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nikolaus Cardinal von Schönberg, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Capua

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1472BornMeissen
149724.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
12 Sep 152048.0AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
21 May 153562.7Elevated to Cardinal
28 Apr 153663.7ResignedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
31 May 153764.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
7 Sep 153765.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Capua, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus von Schönberg:
Nikolaus Cardinal von Schönberg O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Capua

  • a cardinal for 2.2 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015