Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikolaus Schinner

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1437¹Born
31 Aug 149659.6AppointedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
11 Mar 149861.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
30 Aug 149962.6ResignedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
30 Oct 151073.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus Schinner
Bishop Nikolaus Schinner (born 1437, died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSan Giulio, Church, ïle Orta San Giulio, Diocese of Novara, Italy

  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 234
  • ob/c2: CB, 4 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,552
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1498, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast