Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Matthäus Cardinal Schiner (Schinner)

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana

Administrator of Catania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1465¹Born
21 Apr 148924.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 149833.7AppointedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
13 Oct 1499³34.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
10 Mar 151146.1Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 151146.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
6 Feb 151247.0AppointedAdministrator of Novara, Italy
151651.0ResignedAdministrator of Novara, Italy
1 Nov 152055.8AppointedAdministrator of Catania, Italy
30 Sep 152257.7DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matthäus Schiner (Schinner)
Matthäus Cardinal Schiner (Schinner) (born 1465, died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuhlbach in the Canton of Valais
Ordained PriestSanta Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Santa Maria dell’Anima, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
  • a cardinal for 11.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Mar 1511
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 159
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1499, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 234

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 8 Jan 2019

Quantcast