Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikolaus Schienen de Cellis

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

Titular Bishop of Azotus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1491Born
26 Oct 151928.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
26 Oct 151928.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Azotus
6 Nov 151928.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azotus
31 Aug 155665.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus Schienen de Cellis
Bishop Nikolaus Schienen de Cellis (born 1491, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZell/Mosel
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 127
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1519, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 Jun 2018

Quantcast