Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg von Schaumberg

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg


Events

DateEventTitle
18 May 1459SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
13 Jul 1459ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
Mar 1460³Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
4 Feb 1475DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georg von Schaumberg:
Bishop Georg von Schaumberg (died ) Bishop of Bamberg

  • a bishop for 14.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 102
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,924

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013