Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Anton von Schaumberg

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Minden, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1549Born
11 Sep 158738.5AppointedBishop of Minden, Germany
21 Jan 159949.8DiedBishop-Elect of Minden, Germany

MicroData Summary for Anton von Schaumberg
Father Anton von Schaumberg (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Minden

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 245
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1587

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast