Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benoit Judica, O. de M. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Thelepte

Titular See: (Simon Petrus a Santa Catharina)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1720BornPalermo, Italy
30 Dec 173616.0ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
21 Sep 174322.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
20 Sep 177958.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thelepte
21 Dec 177959.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thelepte
27 Nov 179978.9DiedTitular Bishop of Thelepte

MicroData Summary for Benoit Judica:
Bishop Benoit Judica O. de M. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Thelepte

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 401
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015