Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giovanni M. Scalese, B.

Superior of Afghanistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1955 BornRoma, Italy
20 Jun 198125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
4 Nov 201459.2AppointedSuperior of Afghanistan
11 Jan 201559.3InstalledSuperior of Afghanistan

MicroData Summary for Giovanni M. Scalese: VIAF:61467204
Father Giovanni M. Scalese B. (born ) Superior of Afghanistan

Please contact the Father through the Mission "Sui Iuris" of Afghanistan.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2015, Page 1,069
  • i: CB, 15 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015