Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paolo Cardinal Savelli

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622BornRome, Italy
14 Jan 166442.0Elevated to Cardinal
11 Feb 166442.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
14 Jan 166947.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
14 May 167048.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
23 May 167856.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
15 Nov 168361.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
11 Sep 168563.6DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin

MicroData Summary for Paolo Savelli:
Paolo Cardinal Savelli (died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin

  • a cardinal for 21.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Jan 1664

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015