Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Sarnelli

Deceased

Bishop of Muro Lucano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1655Born
26 Dec 169035.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Apr 170348.2AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
15 Sep 170752.6DiedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Sarnelli
Bishop Andrea Sarnelli (born , died ) Bishop of Muro Lucano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBracigliano

  • a priest for 16.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 277
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast