Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saraceno, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si)

Titular Bishop of Loryma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1679BornConca, Italy
1706¹26.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jul 172748.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si), China
12 Nov 172849.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Loryma
5 Feb 173050.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Loryma
7 Dec 174263.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si), China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saraceno:
Bishop Francesco Saraceno O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si)

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 247
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015