Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Garetto Ferreri, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si)

Titular Bishop of Hephaestus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1688BornFerreri, Italy
27 Sep 173042.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si), China
27 Sep 173042.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
20 Apr 173243.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
8 Jan 173849.5DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si), China

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Garetto Ferreri:
Bishop Francesco Maria Garetto Ferreri O.F.M. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si)

  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 233, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015