Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josť Sanz de Villaragut, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cefalý, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1633²Born
6 Dec 168350.9AppointedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
2 Jan 169360.0AppointedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
18 Jun 169663.4AppointedBishop of Cefalý, Italy
29 Aug 169865.6DiedBishop of Cefalý, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josť Sanz de Villaragut
Bishop Josť Sanz de Villaragut O.F.M. (born 1633, died ) Bishop of Cefalý

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaragoza, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 135, and Page 155
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 325
  • b: Episcopologio EspaŮol, Volume 1500, Page 225, Number 1,395
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1683, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast