Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Théodore de Santa Maria, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of São Tomé of Meliapore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1708BornVilla Nova, Portugal
1733¹24.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
2 Oct 175547.1SelectedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
19 Jul 175647.9ConfirmedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
1758¹49.4ResignedBishop-Elect of São Tomé of Meliapore, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Théodore de Santa Maria:
Father Théodore de Santa Maria O.E.S.A. (born ) Former Bishop-Elect of São Tomé of Meliapore

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 405

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 7 Jan 2016