Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Sánchez Duque de Estrada

Deceased

Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581Born
21 Jul 163655.5AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
23 Sep 163756.7InstalledBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
12 Nov 164160.8DiedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Sánchez Duque de Estrada
Bishop Juan Sánchez Duque de Estrada (born 1581, died ) Bishop of Guadalajara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Cruz de la Jara, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 198
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 164, Number 1,029
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast