Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alamanno Cardinal Salviati

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1669Born
8 Feb 173060.8Elevated to Cardinal
24 Jul 173061.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
24 Feb 173363.9DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

MicroData Summary for Alamanno Salviati
Alamanno Cardinal Salviati (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFlorence, Italy

  • a cardinal for 3.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Feb 1730

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast