Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gregorio Antonio Maria Cardinal Salviati

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1727Born
23 Jun 177749.5Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jul 177749.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
27 Sep 178052.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
29 Nov 179062.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
5 Aug 179466.6DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Antonio Maria Salviati
Gregorio Antonio Maria Cardinal Salviati (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 17.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Jun 1777

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast