Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bertalan Sahin

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Romania (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1903Born
14 Oct 192825.4Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 197168.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Romania (Armenian)
5 May 197471.0DiedApostolic Administrator of Romania (Armenian)

MicroData Summary for Bertalan Sahin
Father Bertalan Sahin (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Romania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSatu Mare
Death PlaceGyergyószentmiklós

  • a priest for 45.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 6 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast