Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sacramoro Sacramori

Deceased

Bishop of Parma, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Oct 1475AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
15 Jan 1476AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
25 Aug 1482DiedBishop of Parma, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sacramoro Sacramori
Bishop Sacramoro Sacramori (died ) Bishop of Parma

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 213, and Page 216
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1475, Number 43*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 20 Nov 2018

Quantcast