Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Sacrati

Deceased

Bishop of Carpentras, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1518Born
2 Jun 157253.5AppointedBishop of Carpentras, France
1 Jan 159374.1DiedBishop of Carpentras, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Sacrati (VIAF: 287801869)
Bishop Jacques Sacrati (born , died ) Bishop of Carpentras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFerrare, Diocese of Ferrara, Italy
Death PlaceCarpentras, Diocese of Carpentras

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 154
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1572, Number 9*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast