Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Sachsen-Lauenburg

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1483¹Born
12 Jul 150320.5SelectedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
13 Jul 150421.5ConfirmedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
5 Jan 151128.0Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
6 May 152744.3ResignedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
20 Nov 154764.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Hildesheim, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann von Sachsen-Lauenburg (VIAF: 86135412)
Bishop Johann von Sachsen-Lauenburg (born 1483, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim

  • a bishop for 36.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1504, Number 24*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 210

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast