Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Adalbert zu Sachsen

Deceased

Archbishop-Elect of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1464¹Born
12 Jan 148117.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mainz, Germany
6 May 148218.3SucceededArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
1 May 148420.3DiedArchbishop-Elect of Mainz, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adalbert zu Sachsen (VIAF: 72194205)
Father Adalbert zu Sachsen (born 1464, died ) Archbishop-Elect of Mainz

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 184
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1481, Number 12*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 1 Dec 2018

Quantcast