Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude de Saint-Bonnet de Thoiras

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nîmes, France


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Oct 1621AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nîmes, France
25 Oct 1621AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Bithynia
13 Mar 1622Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Bithynia
12 Sep 1625³SucceededBishop of Nîmes, France
Feb 1633³ResignedBishop of Nîmes, France
4 May 1642DiedBishop Emeritus of Nîmes, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude de Saint-Bonnet de Thoiras
Bishop Claude de Saint-Bonnet de Thoiras (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nîmes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontferriez-sur-Lez

  • a bishop for 20.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 126, and Page 255
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast