Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Charles William Russell

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Ceylon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1812BornKillough, Co. Down, Ireland
13 Jun 183523.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 184230.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ceylon, Sri Lanka
20 Sep 184230.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyzon
26 Feb 188067.7DiedPriest

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Charles William Russell (VIAF: 32755427)
Father Charles William Russell (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Ceylon

  • a priest for 44.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Nov 2016