Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Maria Cardinal Ruffo

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1687Born
9 Sep 174356.2Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 174356.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
28 Dec 174457.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 175365.6DiedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Ruffo (VIAF: 89080871)
Antonio Maria Cardinal Ruffo (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagnara, Italy

  • a priest for 8.1 years
  • a cardinal for 9.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast