Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fabrizio Dionigi Cardinal Ruffo

Deceased

Chamberlain Emeritus of the College of Cardinals

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1744Born
26 Sep 179147.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
21 Feb 179449.4Elevated to Cardinal
12 Sep 179449.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
11 Aug 180055.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
29 Mar 181974.5AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the College of Cardinals
21 Feb 182075.4ResignedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the College of Cardinals
27 Jun 182176.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
13 Dec 182783.2DiedChamberlain Emeritus of the College of Cardinals

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Dionigi Ruffo (VIAF: 59880281)
Fabrizio Dionigi Cardinal Ruffo (born , died ) Chamberlain Emeritus of College of Cardinals

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Lucido, Italy

  • a cardinal for 36.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Sep 1791

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018