Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefan Sylwester Rudnicki-Lubieniecki, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1713²BornWolinia, Poland
1736²23.0ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1738¹25.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
8 May 175037.3AppointedBishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
4 Mar 175239.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
7 May 177764.3DiedBishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefan Sylwester Rudnicki-Lubieniecki
Bishop Stefan Sylwester Rudnicki-Lubieniecki O.S.B.M. (born 1713, died ) Bishop of Lutzk e Ostrog

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 264
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 7
  • d: CB, 12 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 23 Sep 2016