Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wolfhard von Roth

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Aug 1288AppointedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
4 Jun 1290Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
13 Jan 1302DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Wolfhard von Roth (VIAF: 102677054)
Bishop Wolfhard von Roth (died ) Bishop of Augsburg

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 116
  • b/c2: CB, 2 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast