Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giordano Rota, O.S.B.

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy

Priest of Order of Saint Benedict


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1970 Born
1 Sep 199626.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
30 Sep 200030.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Oct 201040.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
1 Jul 201343.2ResignedApostolic Administrator of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giordano Rota
Father Giordano Rota O.S.B. (born ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBergamo, Diocese of Bergamo

Please contact the Father through the Territorial Abbey of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • r: CB, 16 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast