Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Marcus Antonius Rossi

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Termoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1640BornCasoriae
14 Jun 168848.0AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
27 Jun 168848.1DiedBishop-Elect of Termoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marcus Antonius Rossi:
Priest Marcus Antonius Rossi (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Termoli

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 376

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013