Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Scipione Roero, O. Humiliat. †

Deceased

Bishop of Asti, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jul 1529AppointedBishop of Asti, Italy
17 Aug 1529Ordained BishopBishop of Asti, Italy
1536²DiedBishop of Asti, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Scipione Roero
Bishop Scipione Roero O. Humiliat. (died 1536) Bishop of Asti

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 121
  • ob/c2: CB, 14 Mar 2014
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,529, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast