Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Anton von Rodenstein

Deceased

Bishop of Worms, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1579Born
161030.2Ordained PriestPriest of Speyer, Germany
20 Aug 162949.8SelectedBishop of Worms, Germany
13 Nov 163051.1ConfirmedBishop of Worms, Germany
30 Oct 165273.0DiedBishop of Worms, Germany

MicroData Summary for George Anton von Rodenstein
Bishop George Anton von Rodenstein (born , died ) Bishop of Worms

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRodenstein

  • a priest for 42.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 373
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1631, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018