Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lope Rodrigo de Villalobos

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Oct 1382AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
10 Feb 1383Ordained BishopBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
21 Jun 1386DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Lope Rodrigo de Villalobos
Bishop Lope Rodrigo de Villalobos (died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 444
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,982
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 305, Number 171

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast