Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Rodríguez de Arriaga, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1582¹Born
10 Aug 164866.6SelectedBishop of Guadix, Spain
7 Dec 164866.9ConfirmedBishop of Guadix, Spain
1649²67.0Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
4 Dec 165169.9DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Rodríguez de Arriaga
Bishop Bernardino Rodríguez de Arriaga O.S.A. (born 1582, died ) Bishop of Guadix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoria

  • a bishop for 2.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 198
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 179, Number 1,117
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,649, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast