Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ignacio Rodríguez Cornejo

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1694Born
15 Dec 174551.7AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
1746²51.7Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
23 Feb 175055.9AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
Dec 1755²61.7DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Ignacio Rodríguez Cornejo
Bishop José Ignacio Rodríguez Cornejo (born , died Dec 1755) Bishop of Plasencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlmonacid

  • a bishop for 9.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 65, Number 303
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,746, Number 49
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 325, and Page 340

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast