Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Robobelli

Deceased

Archbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Nov 1485AppointedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
6 Jan 1491AppointedBishop of Feltre, Italy
19 Dec 1494AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
1503¹DiedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Robobelli
Archbishop Giovanni Robobelli (died 1503) Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 166, and Page 153
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 77
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1485, Number 36*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast